Accounts and annual returns WORLD OF HOPE

Charity number: 1129740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 10 May 2024 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 10 May 2024 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 January 2022 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 January 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 18 March 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 18 March 2021 79 days late Download Open in new window