Financial history WORLD OF HOPE

Charity number: 1129740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.91k £25.60k £12.42k £27.15k £92.94k
Total expenditure £41.07k £16.82k £12.26k £26.64k £93.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.00k £10.00k N/A £23.80k £11.81k