Financial history VIVA PALESTINA

Charity number: 1129092
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £697.04k £300.08k £46.54k £17.79k £343
Total expenditure £453.30k £475.75k £153.87k £13.80k £672
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £694.55k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £2.36k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £137 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £370.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £36.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £16.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £3.95k N/A N/A N/A N/A