VIVA PALESTINA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activity of the charity during the period was the delivery of aid to the people of Gaza
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 08 April 2009: Standard registration
- 14 September 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LIFELINE FOR GAZA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £697.04k | £300.08k | £46.54k | £17.79k | £343 | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.30k | £475.75k | £153.87k | £13.80k | £672 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £694.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £137 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £370.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £16.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1) PROVISION FROM THE UK OF FOOD, MEDICINE AND ESSENTIAL GOODS AND SERVICES NEEDED BY THE CIVILIAN POPULATION. 2) HIGHLIGHTING THE CAUSES AND RESULTS OF WARS WITH A VIEW TO ACHIEVING PEACE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window