Financial history SHANTHONA WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity number: 1133117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.98k £4.21k £17.70k £13.00k £44.50k
Total expenditure £16.35k £427 £7.78k £20.60k £29.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £13.00k N/A