Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ISRAEL EMERGENCY AID FUND

Charity number: 1129660
Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2022 265 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required