THE OUTWARD BOUND TRUST

Charity number: 1128090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Outward Bound Trust unlocks the potential of young people through discovery and adventure in the wild. It runs courses at residential centres in the Lake District, North Wales and the Highlands, translating experiences in the mountains, sea, lakes and rivers into lessons for life. A bursary programme ensures courses are open to all young people regardless of their financial circumstances.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 2009: Standard registration
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 24 January 2024: Funds received from 268645 MRS S L CHAMBERS' CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • OUTWARD BOUND GLOBAL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maureen McKenna Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Mark William Baker Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Lynn Stacey Rattigan Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Joanna Christine Hallas Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Sir David Kim Hempleman-Adams Trustee 23 September 2022
THE INTERNATIONAL GOLF CHARITY
Received: On time
Helen Mary Turnbull Wright Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Nicholas James Sanderson Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Youlande Harrowell Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
HRH Princess Beatrice Elizabeth Mary of York Trustee 11 March 2019
None on record
PAUL MARCUS GEORGE VOLLER Trustee 12 March 2018
CCHF ALLABOUTKIDS
Received: On time
Jonathan Wayne Lewis Trustee 14 December 2017
OUTWARD BOUND GLOBAL
Received: On time
LEO HOULDING Trustee 20 March 2017
WINDERMERE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: 52 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £16.18m £13.19m £9.57m £16.07m £19.03m
Total expenditure £16.13m £13.61m £11.11m £15.59m £17.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.00k £2.65m £2.72m N/A £75.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £5.19m £7.36m £6.71m £5.53m £5.44m
Income - Other trading activities £4.37m £2.00m £1.84m £5.03m £4.38m
Income - Charitable activities £6.50m £3.76m £974.85k £5.41m £7.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £122.93k £70.46k £32.81k £102.00k £663.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.41m
Income - Legacies £178.59k £1.20m £27.27k £30.00k £304.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.42m £9.83m £7.70m £11.14m £12.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.04m £1.51m £1.43m £1.64m £2.00m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £27.45k £28.65k £26.70k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £2.67m £2.26m £1.99m £2.81m £3.37m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £15.71m £15.40m £14.89m £14.75m £14.98m
Long-term investments £1.49m £1.44m £1.66m £1.49m £1.55m
Other assets £14.32m £13.27m £15.92m £17.70m £18.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.57m £2.62m £5.94m £7.11m £6.74m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 22 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 26 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Outward Bound Trust
Hackthorpe Hall
Hackthorpe
Penrith
CA10 2HX
Phone:
01931 740000