Accounts and annual returns THE WORKS SKATEPARK

Charity Number: 1127873
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 September 2016 On Time