THE WORKS SKATEPARK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide or assist in the provision of facilities and instruction for healthy recreation or other leisure time occupation and in particular roller skating, skateboarding, BMX biking and related recreational activities with the object of improving their conditions of life and in the interests of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income:
£551,184
Donations and legacies | £58.39k | |
Charitable activities | £490.20k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £91 | |
Other | £2.51k |
Total expenditure:
£559,374
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £559.37k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £559.37k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 February 2009: Standard registration
- 19 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £498.82k | £365.15k | £638.96k | £685.31k | £551.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.47k | £420.29k | £599.70k | £737.00k | £559.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £87.49k | £0 | £58.39k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £2.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £549.20k | £685.31k | £490.20k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £165 | £0 | £91 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £2.51k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £593.86k | £737.00k | £559.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £1.37k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £378.71k | £348.23k | £366.44k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £138 | £138 | £138 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £260.68k | £187.04k | £173.45k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £192.79k | £140.34k | £153.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 31 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 31 May 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 05 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
05 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 24 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 29 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES: • TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HEALTHY RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND IN PARTICULAR ROLLER SKATING, SKATEBOARDING, BMX BIKING AND RELATED RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE; • TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN ROLLER SKATING, SKATEBOARDING, BMX BIKING AND RELATED RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, INCLUDING AMATEUR FILM MAKING TO ADVANCE THEIR PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND MENTAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT; • TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION IN THE AMATEUR SPORTS OF ROLLER SKATING, SKATEBOARDING, BMX BIKING AND RELATED AMATEUR SPORTS; AND • TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window