TURNER CONTEMPORARY

Charity Number: 1129974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal objective of the company is the provision of a permanent gallery in Margate for the visual arts organisation which celebrates JMW Turner's association with Margate and, through a varied programme of exhibitions and events and learning activities, promotes an understanding and enjoyment of historical and contemporary art.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MATTHEW SLOTOVER Chair 01 January 2023
MURMUR
Received: On time
Tanya Barson Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Clifford McLean Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Susan Carey Trustee 07 March 2024
None on record
Brian James Horton Trustee 25 January 2024
THE SURESERVE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SARAH DARGAN Trustee 09 June 2023
None on record
MICHEL DRIESSEN Trustee 09 June 2023
None on record
NICK MAYNARD Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
Yasmin Khan Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Peter Hawkes Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Sir Stephen Deuchar CBE Trustee 01 April 2021
CREATIVE FOLKESTONE
Received: On time
Keith Valentine Trustee 01 April 2021
THE ROYAL SCHOOL FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.69m £2.78m £2.52m £3.48m £3.83m
Total expenditure £4.12m £2.37m £3.10m £3.30m £3.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £210.23k
Income from government grants £2.13m N/A £1.82m £905.00k £717.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £283.13k £122.64k £195.84k £470.96k £677.92k
Income - Other trading activities £482.45k £0 £463.40k £578.50k £594.22k
Income - Charitable activities £2.61m £0 £1.82m £2.05m £2.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £63.43k £0 £57.21k £67.53k £81.49k
Income - Other £247.99k £0 £47.46k £311.96k £312.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.55m £2.08m £2.72m £2.78m £2.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £557.61k £292.59k £377.99k £522.26k £731.26k
Expenditure - Governance £6.95k £0 £9.21k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £17.41k £19.58k £17.40k
Expenditure - Other £10.57k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £36.03k £0 £29.41k £10.50k £8.26k
Long-term investments £2.30m £0 £2.95m £2.72m £2.98m
Other assets £1.06m £0 £1.26m £1.49m £1.72m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £35.68k £0 £230.22k £306.67k £364.22k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RENDEZVOUS
MARGATE
KENT
CT9 1HG
Phone:
01843233000