THE FRAGILE X SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fragile X is a family of inherited genetic conditions, including Fragile X Syndrome. We provide information and practical guidance to support and empower individuals and families living with Fragile X We educate and inform public and professionals about Fragile X, to raise awareness and understanding and improve care We encourage and publicise research into Fragile X
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Harris | Chair | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Patricia Eleanor Grace Pattison | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Aiste Skegg | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Jonny Cobbold | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Zeinab Ali | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Tim Eccleshall | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Andy Clarke | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Marie Williams | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Andrew Jaques | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Anne Eccleshall | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Mary Martin | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.71k | £148.12k | £205.52k | £137.70k | £133.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.51k | £120.84k | £127.65k | £162.97k | £147.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 22 Sep 2020 as amended on 07 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 To advance the health and well being of individuals affected by the genetic condition known as the Fragile X Syndrome and associated conditions 3.2 To advance public education about the syndrome in order to help improve the environment, conditions and services offered to people with Fragile X and associated conditions, and their families.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 5
The Chestnuts
4 Stortford Road
Great Dunmow
Great Du
- Phone:
- 01371875100
- Email:
- info@fragilex.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window