Financial history CARDIFF CITY FC COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.77m £1.54m £1.76m £1.74m £1.65m
Total expenditure £1.69m £1.48m £1.72m £1.79m £1.75m
Income from government contracts N/A £22.15k £31.25k £86.24k £67.00k
Income from government grants £11.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £227.57k £213.92k £221.95k £235.54k £232.05k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.33m £1.54m £1.51m £1.41m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.43m £1.49m £1.78m £1.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £92.49k £50.38k £23.53k £3.87k £1.57k
Expenditure - Governance £5.70k £20.47k £0 £38.68k £39.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £112.12k £0 £209.21k £0 £209.57k