CHESHIRE VIEW MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance to organisations and individuals in the greater Chester area to enable them to purchase equipment or other assets to enable applicants or organisations to achieve their charitable objectives. Donations will also be considered for established charities or as directed by donors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 24 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN PAUL CROSS | Chair | 21 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Andrew Peter Christopher Tong | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emlyn Cole Jones | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lewis | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PIERS VERLING JOHN DUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.95k | £8.60k | £0 | £25 | £350 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.34k | £6.58k | £0 | £3.41k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 September 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 05 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE, WITHIN AN APPROXIMATE 30 MILE RADIUS OF CHRISTLETON, CHESHIRE, INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CHRISTLETON, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FREEMASONS HALL (CHESTER) LTD
CHESHIRE VIEW
PLOUGH LANE
CHRISTLETON
CHESTER
CH3 7PT
- Phone:
- 01244332442
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window