CHRISTIAN SKATERS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious outreach network including information sharing of ideas and best practice, plus any resources available to churches and other organisations etc. Specifically working within the 'Skate' community of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Coombs | Trustee | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY FUNNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP GEORGE MCKAY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30 | £122 | £272 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £383 | £0 | £325 | £113 | £344 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 WALNUT CLOSE
NAILSEA
BRISTOL
BS48 4YH
- Phone:
- 07774138143
- Email:
- info@christianskaters.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window