SALIFU DAGARTI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES EDUCATION / TRAINING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OVERSEAS AID / FAMINE RELIEF ARTS / CULTURE / HERITAGE / SCIENCE ANIMALS ENVIRONMENT / CONSERVATION / HERITAGE ECONOMIC / COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT / EMPLOYMEN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
- Throughout London
- Burkina Faso
- Ghana
- Guinea-bissau
- India
- Liberia
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 04 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAJA NANA SALIFU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Linda Adjoa scott | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMINA MORO | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.56k | £24.51k | £11.21k | £21.40k | £12.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £43.54k | £29.50k | £37.48k | £12.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.68k | £4.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 January 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 October 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 7 AUGUST 2009 AND 16 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE BENEFIT AMONGST PEOPLE OF AFRICAN DESCENT BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ALL ASPECTS OF THE AFRICAN HISTORY AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRATICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Brookside Hall Biling
Lings Local Centre
Brook Road
- Phone:
- 07401435003
- Email:
- info@salifudagarti.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window