Accounts and annual returns TRANSFORM INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1128469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2024 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 March 2022 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 November 2020 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required