COVENTRY ASIAN SPORTS FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote sports of Asian origin in the UK, and to encourage multicultural organisations into participating in sporting events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 03 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SATNAM SINGH GILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shinder Singh Pahal | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
BHAJAN SINGH SAMRA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.30k | £2.02k | £3 | £46.57k | £112.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.54k | £1.00k | £0 | £38.39k | £74.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 February 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 February 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS), BEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF COVENTRY AND ITS SURROUNDS ARE: 2.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS COMMONLY PARTICIPATED IN ASIA SUCH AS KABADDI, HOCKEY, FOOTBALL, VOLLEYBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ('FACILITIES' IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING OF SPORTING ACTIVITIES). 2.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Barnack Avenue
COVENTRY
CV3 6LA
- Phone:
- 02477057637
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window