Accounts and annual returns FWOG OUTREACH CENTRE

Charity number: 1128438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 25 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window