FAMILIES IN CARE
Charity number: 1128642
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
Registration history:
- 18 March 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY PARENTS WHOSE CHILDREN HAVE BEEN TAKEN INTO CARE OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING TAKEN INTO CARE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window