EMMAUS SUFFOLK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DEVELOPMENT OF EMMAUS COMMUNITIES IN THE SUFFOLK AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£740,774
Donations and legacies | £433.07k | |
Charitable activities | £306.33k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.37k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£592,695
Raising funds | £62.47k | |
Charitable activities | £530.23k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £62.47k | |
Charitable expenditure | £530.23k | |
Retained for future use | £148.08k |
People

19 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 February 2009: Standard registration
- EMMAUS IPSWICH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Gallant | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Dodds | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Wolley | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Fahie | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Balaam | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Elizabeth Quantrill | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alok Ruia | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £269.00k | £441.62k | £338.07k | £526.25k | £740.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.54k | £254.63k | £334.50k | £552.79k | £592.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k | £31.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £295.09k | £433.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £231.06k | £306.33k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £104 | £1.37k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £382.11k | £530.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £170.69k | £62.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.60k | £75.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £49.54k | £192.38k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £236.03k | £230.51k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.40k | £41.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 SEP 2017 as amended on 16 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE ALLEVIATION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM, IN CONFORMANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE EMMAUS MOVEMENT AS PUBLISHED FROM TIME TO TIME BY EMMAUS UK, TO THOSE IN NEED WITHOUT DISTINCTION BY: 1 THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, OR ASSISTANCE IN SUCH PROVISION, FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE IN THE IPSWICH AREA AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS MAY SEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME ('THE BENEFICIARIES') 2 THE REHABILITATION OF THE BENEFICIARIES AS APPROPRIATE AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, EMPLOYMENT TRAINING) AND WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND SATISFACTION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WITH THE PURPOSE OF DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT IN THE FUTURE AND THEREBY DEVELOP A SENSE OF SELF WORTH AND DIGNITY THROUGH HAVING A SELF-SUPPORTING LIFE 3 THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF OTHER EMMAUS COMMUNITIES AND GROUPS OR OTHER AGENCIES IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HOMELESSNESS WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE EXCHANGE OF RESOURCES, INFORMATION AND EXPERTISE WITH OTHER EMMAUS PROJECTS WORLDWIDE 4 THE FULFILLING OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME E RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS BEING CHARITABLE AND WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dales
216 Dales Road
IPSWICH
IP1 4JY
- Phone:
- 01473225627
- Email:
- hello@emmaussuffolk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window