Trustees EMMAUS SUFFOLK LIMITED

Charity number: 1128051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gemma Gallant Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Gregory Dodds Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Hugh Wolley Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Jonathan Fahie Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Lisa Balaam Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Wendy Elizabeth Quantrill Trustee 14 December 2022
None on record
Alok Ruia Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record