ROCHFORD DISTRICT SCHOOLS PARTNERSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the advancement of education and welfare of children attending member schools in the Rochford District and neighbouring distict/borough areas. To offer holistic, professional support and advice to parents/families of the member schools faced with difficult life challenges, in particular for children with SEND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 03 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Ian Stanley Osborn | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Milner | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Goodier | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kath Sansom | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS NIKKI PATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA JANE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.08k | £6.08k | £200.00k | £254.71k | £314.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.66k | £169.86k | £228.34k | £286.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
18 March 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 JANUARY 2010. as amended on 14 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are to advance education for the public benefit by supporting schools and colleges to improve access to education, in particular but not exclusively by providing support services for pupils, their families and staff, including but not limited to counselling, mentoring, support groups and advice, predominantly but not solely in Essex.
Area of benefit
ROCHFORD DISTRICT IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The King Edmund School
Vaughan Close
ROCHFORD
Essex
SS4 1TL
- Phone:
- 01702545771
- Email:
- kimchant@kes.essex.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window