Accounts and annual returns GIRAFFE CONSERVATION FOUNDATION (GCF)

Charity Number: 1129334
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 20 October 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 July 2016 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 06 July 2016 157 days late
Annual return 31 March 2014 02 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 02 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 01 February 2014 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 28 January 2014 On Time