GIRAFFE CONSERVATION FOUNDATION (GCF)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GCF is working to build a sustainable future where all giraffe populations and (sub) species are protected and secure in the wild. GCF seeks to promote the importance and profile of giraffe conservation and work collaboratively with local communities to develop a sustainable future for both people and wildlife.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kenya
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 28 April 2009: Standard registration
- 25 January 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.20k | £37.95k | £81.58k | £156.37k | £297.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.37k | £28.26k | £70.87k | £94.46k | £232.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 20 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 06 July 2016 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 06 July 2016 | 157 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 02 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 01 February 2014 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 28 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
1. CONSERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF ALL SPECIES OF GIRAFFE; AND 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INTO TECHNIQUES TO IMPROVE THE WELFARE OF SUCH ANIMALS AND DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF THE RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window