Trustees CAERPHILLY BOROUGH MIND
Charity Number: 1128082

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARI ANN RADFORD | Chair | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Denton | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Clemens | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Clemens | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Parfitt | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARMEN MARIE BEZZINA | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.