Financial history ARC COMMUNITY TRUSTEES

Charity number: 1130383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £730.15k £673.55k £715.76k £689.86k £788.65k
Total expenditure £817.26k £741.57k £704.05k £780.44k £769.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.47k £6.94k £7.39k £4.11k £19.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £200 £0 £1.88k £1.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £568 £2.09k
Income - Charitable activities £717.69k £672.29k £707.99k £687.42k £785.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £12.47k £1.06k £385 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £200 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £817.26k £741.57k £704.05k £780.44k £769.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £42.92k £0 £35.52k £35.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £74.90k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0