BRADFORD BASE SOCIAL ENTERPRISE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides training and social enterprise activities, including ESOL and cultural orientation programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Kirklees
Governance
- 24 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gurmeet Virdi | Chair | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Freye | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hibbits | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Targett | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Hao Zheng | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Gates-Hartley | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Thomas | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdulmateen Khan | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ray Milne | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NOBLE | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
HUW SCOTT JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERNIE GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298.79k | £246.79k | £219.20k | £328.72k | £307.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.38k | £237.13k | £216.22k | £326.49k | £303.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TRAINING AND RETRAINING AMONG THOSE PERSONS WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT AND OF SUCH TRAINING FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS; 3.2 TO PROVIDE EXPERIENCE OF REGULAR WORK FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNEMPLOYED TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED;
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Horton Housing Association
Chartford House
54 Little Horton Lane
BRADFORD
BD5 0BS
- Phone:
- 01274370689
- Email:
- mail@bradfordbase.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window