Financial history CARDIFF OLYMPIC GYMNASTICS

Charity number: 1129295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £131.30k £94.27k £145.23k £127.81k £126.10k
Total expenditure £102.99k £68.67k £139.81k £125.73k £131.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £55.00k £45.00k N/A N/A N/A