Financial history JOBSERVE SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB

Charity number: 1128650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £66.93k £55.05k £66.82k £63.93k £80.53k
Total expenditure £53.44k £36.56k £62.55k £87.02k £93.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.95k N/A N/A N/A