LAP RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support research, education and public awareness into/of disease of the liver, pancreas and biliary tree
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILES EDWARD LEO BOND-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT RAYNER HUTCHINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.16k | £128.06k | £17.34k | £51.62k | £100.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.43k | £33.60k | £1.55k | £69.78k | £72.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AMONGST PEOPLE WITH LIVER, PANCREATIC AND BILIARY DISORDERS; AND B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN LIVER, PANCREATIC AND BILIARY DISORDERS: IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING THE STUDY, RESEARCH AND KNOWLEDGE OF ALL ASPECTS OF LIVER, PANCREATIC AND BILIARY DISORDERS BY THE FUNDING OF RESEARCH AND THE PRESENTATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Stone Meadow
OXFORD
OX2 6TQ
- Phone:
- 01865514273
- Email:
- kathrynbondsmith@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window