THE LONDON JUNIOR CHESS CHAMPIONSHIP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Charitable Trust to advance education by providing or assisting in the provision of facilities for the teaching, development and supervision of the playing of chess amongst persons under the age of 21 years resident in England and Wales, or eligible to represent England and Wales, so as to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 03 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nell Butler | Chair | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Ezra Lutton | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Angela Eyton | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR ARNOLD LUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEVILLE BELINFANTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY NICCOLI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARC ANDREW SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.59k | £8.57k | £6.07k | £19.60k | £29.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.02k | £2.93k | £4.91k | £19.34k | £28.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 25 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 25 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TEACHING DEVELOPMENT AND SUPERVISION OF THE PLAYING OF CHESS AMONGST PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF TWENTY-ONE YEARS RESIDENT IN ENGLAND AND WALES OR ELIGIBLE TO REPRESENT ENGLAND AND WALES AT CHESS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Greenisland Road
Portadown
CRAIGAVON
County Armagh
BT62 1UZ
- Phone:
- 07513592894
- Email:
- entry@ljcc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window