CAIUS HOUSE

Charity number: 1130066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TABLE TENNIS ARTS COOKERY DANCE POOL AND SNOOKER FOOTBALL BOXING MARTIAL ARTS DRAMA BASKETBALL MUSIC STUDIO DAY EXCURSIONS LIFE SKILLS COMPUTING

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £493,179
Total expenditure: £547,995

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Edward Nettlefold Chair 15 March 2017
None on record
Simone Allen Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Virgo Trustee 26 July 2019
None on record
James Morris Trustee 23 March 2017
None on record
JOHNNY COLVILLE Trustee 19 September 2013
None on record
CALLY HAMMOND REVD DR Trustee
GONVILLE AND CAIUS COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE FOUNDED IN HONOUR OF THE ANNUNCIATION OF THE BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £362.40k £430.33k £542.80k £487.06k £493.18k
Total expenditure £432.40k £482.81k £582.59k £532.79k £548.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.21k £31.58k £52.30k £39.64k £18.67k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £183.77k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £322.02k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £37.01k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £535.84k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £46.76k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 November 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 November 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Caius House
2 Holman Road
London
SW11 3RL
Phone:
02038186210