ULRIKA ELEONORA SWEDISH PARISH IN LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable objects of the Parish are to advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrine as set down in chapter 1 of the Constitution of The Church of Sweden and to promote general charitable purposes, primarily for the benefit of members of the Parish and those closely associated with them and related institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 March 2010: Standard registration
- 01 February 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 February 2016: Funds transferred to 1155762 THE SWEDISH CHURCH IN LONDON LTD
- THE SWEDISH CHURCH IN LONDON (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £964.78k | £1.24m | £1.49m | £907.74k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.03m | £1.21m | £1.27m | £1.14m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £311.58k | £420.90k | £722.65k | £344.42k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £225.79k | £264.33k | £247.75k | £34.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £419.35k | £509.72k | £427.11k | £500.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.06k | £47.58k | £17.11k | £28.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £71.17k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £45.92k | £0 | £36.50k | £8.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £579.46k | £917.61k | £995.09k | £1.01m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £43.50k | £48.03k | £45.66k | £40.43k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £23.78k | £24.81k | £8.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 08 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 08 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 21 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 21 May 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINE AS SET DOWN IN CHAPTER 1 OF THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHURCH OF SWEDEN, AND 2 TO PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES, PRIMARILY FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE PARISH AND THOSE CLOSELY ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR RELATED INSTITUTIONS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window