Accounts and annual returns ONE 2 ONE - INSPIRED JEWISH LIVING

Charity number: 1129400
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 29 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 December 2016 29 November 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 23 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required