Financial history ONE 2 ONE - INSPIRED JEWISH LIVING

Charity number: 1129400
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 30/12/2016
Total gross income £24.60k £25 £13.49k £23.00k £18.70k
Total expenditure £20.91k £21 £16.90k £21.10k £17.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0