Accounts and annual returns ETHIOPIA EDUCATION AID

Charity number: 1129364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required