Financial history ETHIOPIA EDUCATION AID

Charity number: 1129364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.21k £23.20k £24.71k £12.85k £12.49k
Total expenditure £13.11k £14.50k £30.78k £13.38k £12.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A