THE BANCYFELIN EDUCATION COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OBJECTS / ACTIVITIES - TO PROMOTE RURAL REGENERATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BANCYFELIN BY ALL MEANS POSSIBLE - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF COMMUNITY MEMBERS IN BANCYFELIN - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT BANCYFELIN SCHOOL THE ACTIVITIES OF THE TRUSTEES COVER THE IDENTIFICATION AND CONSIDERATION OF PROJECTS WHICH REALISE THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 February 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 17 June 2009: Standard registration
- 09 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/02/2015 | 15/02/2016 | 15/02/2017 | 15/02/2018 | 15/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01k | £0 | £0 | £50 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2019 | 09 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2018 | 26 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 February 2017 | 29 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR BANCYFELIN VILLAGE AND (AND WITHIN 5 MILES OF THE VILLAGE) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY: B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: C. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: D. THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE: E. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES: F. THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT OR ENHANCEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT: G. THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE: H. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME: I. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 2. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BANCYFELIN VILLAGE AND LAND WITHIN 5 MILES OF THE VILLAGE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BANCYFELIN VILLAGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window