THE TONY BLAIR GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AGI?s mission is to make government work for the world?s poorest people. We do this by supporting effective governance: working with African leaders to build the capacity of their governments to implement the programmes and reforms they need to develop their countries, reduce poverty and improve standards of living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ethiopia
- Guinea
- Liberia
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 03 November 2009: Standard registration
- 21 August 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TONY BLAIR AFRICA GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.93m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £102.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.73m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 May 2021 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 4 FEBRUARY 2009, 20 FEBRUARY 2009 AND 4 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
3.1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EFFICIENT PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION OF GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING POVERTY BY IMPROVING: 3.1.1) THE SKILLS AND CAPACITIES OF INDIVIDUALS WITHIN GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES; AND/OR 3.1.2) THE SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES OF GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES. 3.2) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING POVERTY BY: 3.2.1) THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN COMMUNITIES FACING POVERTY AND/OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE; AND/OR 3.2.2) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 3.3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT GOOD GOVERNANCE AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. IN THESE OBJECTS, "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window