ENFIELD ISLAND VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the quality of life for residents, visitors and homeowners on Enfield Island Village in the London Borough of Enfield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 14 September 2009: Standard registration
- THE ENFIELD ISLAND VILLAGE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Dingle | Chair | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chelliah Krishna Moorthy | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dariusz Ludwinski | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Claire Salugao | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Busby | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Anne Connelly | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Green | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Coleman | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laraine Mary Hodgson | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.95k | £409.29k | £361.90k | £371.96k | £408.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £337.72k | £470.50k | £426.67k | £551.57k | £457.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JUL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ESTATE AND OTHERS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS AND OTHERS; (B) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ESTATE AND OTHERS OF THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS; (D) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (E) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM CRIME; (F) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
40-42 Island Centre Way
ENFIELD
EN3 6GS
- Phone:
- 01992 700435
- Email:
- chairman@eiv.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window