THE SIR HENRY ROYCE MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cherishing the Legacy Providing a safe and accessible home at the Hunt House for the archives, memorabilia and artefacts from the life and history of Sir Henry Royce and the old Rolls-Royce company. Promoting the Ideals To support excellence in engineering by a programme of awards, lectures, exhibitions and events to stimulate interest in engineering issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 March 2009: Standard registration
- 23 March 2021: Funds received from 274487 THE SIR HENRY ROYCE MEMORIAL FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Douglas Fuller | Chair | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Feetham | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Edward Green | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Stephen Steward | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH PEDLER | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|||||
John Francis Neale | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.87k | £177.13k | £164.26k | £135.34k | £93.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.64k | £212.49k | £161.00k | £127.06k | £150.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.29k | £22.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 May 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 May 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 21 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY OF ENGINEERING AND PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE SCIENCE OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERING, ITS HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE PURSUIT OF EXCELLENCE IN THE SCIENCE OF ENGINEERING. 3.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS; 3.2.1 PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING (I) A MUSEUM FOR THE PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF ANY OBJECTS WHATSOEVER IN CONNECTION WITH THE LIFE AND WORKS OF SIR HENRY ROYCE, WAITER OWEN BENTLEY AND OTHER ENGINEERS OF SIMILAR STANDING, THEIR ASSOCIATES AND SUCCESSORS AND IN CONNECTION WITH THE SCIENCE OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERING GENERALLY; (II) A LIBRARY CONTAINING ANY BOOKS MANUSCRIPTS PHOTOGRAPHS FILMS SOUND RECORDS OR OTHER ITEMS WHATSOEVER CONNECTED WITH THE SCIENCE OF ENGINEERING; (III) WORKSHOPS AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR RESEARCH AND STUDY CONNECTED WITH THE SCIENCE OF ENGINEERING; 3.2.2 MAKING AVAILABLE FOR STUDY AND RESEARCH THE CORPUS OF THE PUBLISHED AND UNPUBLISHED RECORDS OF THE EXPERIMENTS RESEARCH AND WORKS OF SIR HENRYROYCE, WAITER OWEN BENTLEY AND OTHER ENGINEERS OF SIMILAR STANDING, THEIR ASSOCIATES AND SUCCESSORS; 3.2.3 PROVIDING GRANTS, LOANS, SCHOLARSHIPS OR OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR RESEARCH OR OTHER PROJECTS OR COURSES CONNECTED WITH THE STUDY OF ENGINEERING; 3.2.4 PROMOTING PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF AND EDUCATION IN THE DISCIPLINE OF ENGINEERING, PARTICULARLY THROUGH COLLABORATION WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS, SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hunt House
70 High Street
Paulerspury
Towcester
NN12 7NA
- Phone:
- 07984533352
- Email:
- admin@henryroyce.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window