DHANYAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of mental and physical health e.g sports, activities. Promotion of educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Tameside
- Pakistan
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raja Wajid Zahoor | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nazakat Ali | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Hassan Raja | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Husnain Lohn | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Raja | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 15 March 2023 | 407 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 15 March 2023 | 772 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN , IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, I.T. AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR ANY OTHER KIND OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR ANY OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID). TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES/OPPORTUNITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 Stockport Road
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL7 0LH
- Phone:
- 07984534739
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window