Financial history LIFE CHANGING MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL LTD

Charity number: 1129414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £90.95k £97.57k £130.24k £198.48k £28.70k
Total expenditure £70.84k £97.11k £121.37k £188.68k £29.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A