VASCULAR ACCESS SOCIETY OF BRITAIN & IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This society holds an annual scientific meeting promoting medical care in the field of dialysis and vascular access. Our income is through membership fees, the cost of attendance at our annual conference and through sponsorship by medical device and pharmaceutical industries. Our annual outgoings currently are related to the running of the annual conference
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 April 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 October 2012: Re-registered
- VASBI (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kate Steiner | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Crane | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.53k | £20.88k | £36.38k | £25.72k | £77.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.84k | £13.00k | £11.31k | £25.14k | £65.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION, SCIENCE AND ART OF VASCULAR ACCESS SURGERY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amethyst CME Limited
High Acre
Easington
POOLE
Aylesbury
HP18 9EZ
- Phone:
- 01844 690020
- Email:
- info@vasbi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window