SUUBI AFRICA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with an organisation in Uganda called Suubi-Africa to provide a home for orphaned, abandoned, deprived children and their supporting families, also other disadvantaged members of the community where operating.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
- THE KWAGALA TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE STEPTOE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carol Watson | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
MIchelle Marie Bellamy | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOSEPH LOW | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth McQuaid Mrs | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Hill | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jenkins | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HOGAN | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA SALLY POWELL | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHNSON | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE STEPTOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.43k | £47.41k | £90.51k | £124.57k | £100.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.65k | £59.15k | £73.22k | £122.87k | £100.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2015 AS AMENDED ON 10 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, THEIR SUPPORTING FAMILY AND OTHER DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY LIVING IN AFRICA WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ARE ORPHANED OR ABANDONED AND BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Whitehall Lane
Iveston
CONSETT
County Durham
DH8 7TA
- Phone:
- 07973101747
- Email:
- becca@suubiafrica.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window