AL QURAN ACADEMY LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Al Quran Academy London works in furthering the advancement of Islamic faith by promoting the teaching, publication, distribution, dissemination and research into the scriptures, commentaries and theological works of the Islamic faith. We have distributed thousands of free copies of the Holy Quran with translation. We have held events to promote faith awareness and also other humanitarian projects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- India
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Pakistan
- Romania
- South Africa
- Spain
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 08 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAFIZ MUNIR UDDIN AHMED | Chair |
|
||||||
Abdullahil Mamoon Al-Azemi | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abul Kalam Moudood Hasan | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD MOZIBAR RAHMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Anisur Rahman | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Mohammed Mosleuddin Farid | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Abdul Bari | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
KHADIJA AKHTER REZAYEE AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £343.13k | £384.25k | £259.17k | £312.79k | £257.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300.45k | £244.65k | £299.22k | £259.77k | £232.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MAST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY PROMOTING THE TEACHING, PUBLICATION, DISTRIBUTION, DISSEMINATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE SCRIPTURES, COMMENTARIES AND THEOLOGICAL WORKS OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN ANY LANGUAGE ANY REGION OF THE WORLD 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND NEED BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE INCLUDING BY SUPPORTING HUMANITARIAN PROJECTS 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND GOODS IN SUPPORT OF STUDENTS FOR THEIR STUDIES 4. TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS 5. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE THESE OBJECTS WILL PARTICULARLY BE UNDERTAKEN IN THE UK AND BANGLADESH.
Area of benefit
UK AND BANGLADESH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6-8 Sutton Street
London
E1 0BB
- Phone:
- 02076508770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window