ALONGSIDE YOU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A free and confidential service of home-based childcare, outings and supportive relationships for children and families living with HIV in East London, provided through trained volunteers. Service options; regular visits, school holiday group outings, youth programme. Services for children aged 0-18 years. We provide training and teaching for groups on the impact of HIV on children in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Hackney
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 28 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Crisp | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Eddo | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VINCENT | Trustee | 11 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
YOLANDA MUSINGUZI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.19k | £28.89k | £30.98k | £30.75k | £23.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.99k | £26.65k | £31.66k | £36.36k | £23.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR CHILDREN THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, LIVING WITH HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) OR ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION, AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BY THE PROVISION OF; (A) SUPPORT SERVICES (B) RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS (C) SMALL GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (D) EDUCATION AND RESEARCH ABOUT HIV
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 50521
LONDON
E16 1XF
- Phone:
- 02074735050
- Email:
- info@alongsideyou.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window