FRIENDS OF BEAUMONT PARK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide recreational and leisure facilities and to preserve and improve Beaumont Park
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 23 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne McDonald | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Steele | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steele | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Coomber | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Rudd | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|||||
John Stevenson | Trustee | 21 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Wilkes | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DEMPSTER | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Connally | Trustee | 09 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.59k | £31.39k | £39.48k | £46.28k | £41.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.36k | £96.64k | £17.38k | £23.24k | £27.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 MARCH 2009. NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 MAR 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
4.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; IN PARTICULAR , BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF BEAUMONT PARK. 4.2 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
HUDDERSFIELD, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DEPOT BEAUMONT PARK
BEAUMONT PARK ROAD
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 7AT
- Phone:
- 01484645217
- Email:
- friends@fobp.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window