LOCAL EDUCATION AND MEDICAL OUTREACH NAMPUNDWE (L.E.M.O.N.) TREE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding and sponsoring health promotion and education in the area around Nampundwe (Zambia). Sponsorship of orphans and vunerable children's schooling, building of schools, clinics and supporting teacher and nurse training. Medical and educational donations are received in the UK and recycled to clinics, schools and hospitals in Zambia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Zambia
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Standard registration
- 20 November 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LEMON TREE FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/05/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £2.03k | £1.79k | £2.19k | £1.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £3.11k | £1.74k | £2.18k | £1.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 April 2013 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 15 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 18 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ALL PEOPLE LIVING IN (AND AROUND) NAMPUNDWE, ZAMBIA, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ORPHANS, WIDOWS, THE HIV POSITIVE AND THE POOR, BY: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND HEALTH EDUCATION; AND D) ANY SUCH OTHER PURPOSES DEEMED CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window