ALYMOS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY ARE; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, THE CHARITY'S DISTRIBUTION POLICY IS TO AVAIL THE INTENDED BENEFICIARIES OF FUNDS ACCORDING TO THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY AS SOON AS THEY ARE IN HAND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
Governance
- 13 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shimon Domb | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
YUTTA DOMB | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Asher Strom | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
MENDEL BLUMENBERG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
REISEL STROM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £263.15k | £20.00k | £341.50k | £321.08k | £408.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.18k | £131.57k | £269.43k | £313.02k | £322.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 September 2024 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 DARENTH ROAD
LONDON
N16 6EJ
- Phone:
- 02088067811
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window